Felix Victor WILSON. 26th September 1920 - 19th July 1988. Royal Navy (VR) Probationary Midshipman on the 29th June 1939, Humber Division.
Commander of HMS Rowan (T.119) Type MS Trawler, from early 1944 to 4th November 1944
His ranks. 29th June 1939, Midshipman, Acting Sub Lieutenant 26th September 1940, Sub Lieutenant 26th September 1941, Lieutenant 26th March 1943, Lieutenant Commander 16th February 1955. Decorations, VDR 12th November 1957.
We are a non commercial community interested only in the discussion of all things military.
We do not sell or authorise the use of images hosted on our servers, if you wish to purchase or use imagery contact the uploader directly.(you will need to register). Any requests received to purchase or use imagery will be ignored. Thank you and welcome to MI.Net
You have been here as a guest for a while, I guess we are doing something right?
Register as a member and join in the discussions, its completely free and we would welcome your contributions.
All the best admin - MI.Net
We value your privacy
We use essential cookies to make this site work, and optional cookies to enhance your experience.